Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00424
Date Filed2021-02-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning Rivada Networks and DOD's current spectrum allocation and the potential sharing of DOD's spectrum allocation with private industry. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told CREW that its request was too broad to search. CREW told DOD that it did not believe the request was too broad. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8213678) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Defense, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-182ERRATA by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-19Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-204LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/20/2021)
2021-03-18GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/18/2021. (jag) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/15/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/14/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/15/21., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/12/2021 (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar