Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUST FUTURES LAW et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00430
Date Filed2021-02-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUST FUTURES LAW
PlaintiffCENTER FOR MEDIA JUSTICE
PlaintiffMIJENTE SUPPORT COMMITTEE
PlaintiffIMMIGRANT DEFENSE PROJECT
Case DescriptionJust Futures Law, Center for Media Justice, Mijente Support Committee, and Immigrant Defense Project submitted requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning Covid-19 data collection. The requesters also asked for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies granted the request for expedited processing and indicated that they would consider the requests for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Just Futures Law and the other requesters filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
245 Murray Lane, S.W.
Washington, D.C. 20528
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
200 Independence Avenue, SW
Washington, DC 20201
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8215726) filed by JUST FUTURES LAW, IMMIGRANT DEFENSE PROJECT, Mijente Support Committee, CENTER FOR MEDIA JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Homeland Security, # 3 Summons U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, # 4 Summons Office of the U.S. Attorney, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-182LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR MEDIA JUSTICE (Sobel, David) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/24/2021) (znmw). (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-183LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Mijente Support Committee (Sobel, David) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/24/2021) (znmw). (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-184LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by IMMIGRANT DEFENSE PROJECT (Sobel, David) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/24/2021) (znmw). (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-185LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUST FUTURES LAW (Sobel, David) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/24/2021) (znmw). (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-19Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-196SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-03-197RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/1/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/31/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-268RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/1/2021; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/11/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/1/2021. (ztd); (See docket entry no. 7 to view.) (Entered: 03/26/2021)
2021-03-319ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar