Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSkylight Engagement, Inc. et al v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2021cv00922
Date Filed2021-02-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Nicholas G. Garaufis
PlaintiffSkylight Engagement, Inc.
PlaintiffAmerican Immigration Council
Case DescriptionSkylight Engagement and the American Immigration Council submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning video of two incidents that happened in June and July 2017 at an aid station operated by U.S. Customs and Border Protection. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Skylight Engagement filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Search - Consultation, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUS Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-191COMPLAINT against US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14172621 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Skylight Engagement, Inc., American Immigration Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Ex B - CBP acknowledgment, # 3 Exhibit Ex C - FOIA correspondence, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Proposed Summons, # 6 Proposed Summons) (Cuti, John) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-22Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-222In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-223This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-224Summons Issued as to US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-03-025AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U.S.; Department of Homeland Security; Customs and Border Protection on February 25, 2021, filed by American Immigration Council, Skylight Engagement, Inc.. (Cuti, John) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-03-056NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Scott Weinberg on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Weinberg, Alex) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-03-297Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by US Customs and Border Protection, US Department of Homeland Security. (Weinberg, Alex) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
2021-04-05MODIFIED ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - 6/4/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/5/2021. (Caggiano, Diana) Modified on 4/5/2021. (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-058MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 7/12/2021 @ 10:15 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 10:15 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 21-0922. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/5/2021. (Caggiano, Diana) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/5/2021) (Caggiano, Diana). Modified on 4/5/2021 (Caggiano, Diana). (Entered: 04/05/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar