Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHASBROUCK v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00444
Date Filed2021-02-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffEDWARD HASBROUCK
Case DescriptionEdward Hasbrouck, a freelance journalist, submitted FOIA requests to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning the work of the Draft Commission, which was created in 2017 to study selective service. NARA divided his requests into requests for temporary records and permanent records. After NARA failed to respond, Hasbrouck filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-211COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8223012) filed by EDWARD HASBROUCK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 02/21/2021)
2021-02-22Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-222SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-223STANDARD ORDER for civil cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 22, 2021. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-03-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/18/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/17/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 2/23/2021 (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-04-125Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar