Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00467
Date Filed2021-02-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
Case DescriptionThe American Wild Horse Campaign submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the agency's Wild Horse and Burro Program System discussing the adoption of wild horses or burros from January 2018 to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked for an estimated date of completion. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AWHC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-231COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8234021) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 02/23/2021)
2021-02-25Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-02-252SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-02-253STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/25/21. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-03-314NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-03-315NOTICE of Consent to Assignment to Magistrate Judge by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-03-316ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-04-01MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than May 3, 2021. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/1/2021. (lcegs2) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
2021-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 5/3/2021. (mac) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar