Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSimatic v. Commissioner of Social Security
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CityTacoma
Case Number3:2021cv05134
Date Filed2021-02-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge J Richard Creatura
PlaintiffMary F Simatic
Case DescriptionMary Simatic submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for records concerning her electronic disabilities file. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Simatic filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantCommissioner of Social Security
DefendantSocial Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-231COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Mary F Simatic. (Summons(es) to be issued) (Receipt # TAC016596) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Transmittal Email) (AMD) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-02-242Summons(es) Issued in Paper Form as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security due to voluminous number of summons(es) filed. (AMD; Issued Summons mailed to Plaintiff 2/24/21) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-02-243CONSENT filed by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KAM) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-02-244ORDER NOT TO PROVIDE COURTESY COPIES OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD: The Administration should not file a paper or CD courtesy copy of the Administrative Record for chambers in this matter. This does not modify the procedure for any other chambers. Signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-03-045ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY MAIL by Judge J Richard Creatura. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons) (Copy mailed to Pltf)(DK) (Mailed on 3/4/2021) Modified on 3/4/2021 (DK). (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-096NOTICE: Plaintiff Mary F Simatic has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-097AMENDED COMPLAINT MARY F SIMATIC against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Mary F Simatic.(Simatic, Mary) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-098AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET COMPLAINT MARY F SIMATIC against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security , filed by Mary F Simatic. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Amended Civil Process Clerk, # 2 Summons Amended Office of Attorney General, # 3 Summons Amended Regional Chief Counsel)(Simatic, Mary) Modified on 3/10/2021. (KMC) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-109RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon the Commissioner of Social Security. (KMC) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-1010RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon the United States Attorney. (KMC) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-1811RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Office of the Attorney General. (GMR) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-3112Second AMENDED COMPLAINT MARY F SIMATIC against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Mary F Simatic. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Form SSA-3288, September 22, 2020, # 2 Exhibit SSA Advance Notice, August 25, 2020, # 3 Exhibit Letter to SSA, September 18, 2020, # 4 Exhibit SSA Notice of Award, September 29, 2020, # 5 Exhibit Request for Reconsideration, October 20, 2020, # 6 Exhibit Letter to Congressman, November 2, 2020, # 7 Exhibit Memorandum, November 3, 2020, # 8 Exhibit Appointment Confirmation, November 10, 2020, # 9 Exhibit Memorandum, December 24, 2020, # 10 Exhibit Memorandum, January 6, 2021, # 11 Exhibit My SSA account, February 9, 2021, # 12 Exhibit Disability Case Document Index, March 22, 2021)(Simatic, Mary) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-04-01NOTICE TO PARTIES: After review of the 12 Second Amended Complaint, it has been determined that the correct Nature of Suit for this action is 864 relating to an appeal of Social Security benefits; moving forward, the case restrictions have been updated for docket entry 12 and all future filings. (KMC) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
2021-04-0213AMENDED ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY MAIL re 5 Order by Judge J Richard Creatura. Note: This Amended Order is only correcting an error in Doc 5 which stated the defendant was proceeding in forma pauperis, when in fact she is not. This is not an Order directing further service by mail. (KAM) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar