Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00475
Date Filed2021-02-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of Interior for records concerning the clearing of protestors from Layette Square so that then President Donald Trump could take a photo in front of St. Thomas's Episcopal Church. CREW also requested a fee waiver and inclusion in the media fee category. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from either agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-241COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8237563) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DHS, # 3 Summons Dep't of the Interior, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-02-24Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-02-242SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-03-223RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/12/2021; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 3/12/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/15/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/14/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/15/21. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar