Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN v. UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00489
Date Filed2021-02-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Central Command for records concerning communications between the Central Command and Erik Prince, the former head of security contractor Blackwater Worldwide. Public Citizen also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Public Citizen contacted the agency several times for an estimated date of completion. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-251COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8244328) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Liu, Wendy) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-02-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN (Liu, Wendy) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-02-25Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-02-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-03-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/16/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/15/2021. (Liu, Wendy) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/16/2021. (Liu, Wendy) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-246NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar