Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBORDEN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00527
Date Filed2021-03-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJEREMY BORDEN
Case DescriptionJeremy Borden submitted eight FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning DHS press releases pertaining to returning artifacts to Iraq. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Borden filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-011NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel M. Clattenburg on behalf of JEREMY BORDEN (Clattenburg, Rachel) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-012COMPLAINT against JEREMY BORDEN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8258282) filed by JEREMY BORDEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Attorney General, # 3 Summons to Department of Homeland Security, # 4 Summons US Attorney's Office)(Zieve, Allison) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-013NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Liu on behalf of JEREMY BORDEN (Liu, Wendy) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-01Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-024SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-03-025STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 2, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-03-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/11/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/10/2021. (Zieve, Allison) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-177NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-04-128ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar