Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBEVILL v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00535
Date Filed2021-03-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJAMES P. BEVILL
Case DescriptionJames Bevill submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning his father-in-law Paul Le Baron Springer, who had worked for the CIA. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Bevill filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-011COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8259348) filed by JAMES P. BEVILL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons CIA, # 4 Summons Attorney General)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-01NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to sobel@att.net, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format. (zsb, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-012ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA Civil Cover Sheet by JAMES P. BEVILL re 1 Complaint, filed by JAMES P. BEVILL. (Sobel, David) . Modified on 3/2/2021 (zsb). (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-02NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to sobel@att.net, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-03-023CIVIL COVER SHEET by JAMES P. BEVILL re 1 Complaint, filed by JAMES P. BEVILL. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by JAMES P. BEVILL.(Sobel, David) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-03-02Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-03-024SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-03-195ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/19/2021. (DM) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-236NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-247Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-03-24MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, in which Defendant requests an enlargement of three weeks to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Plaintiff consents to the requested extension. The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant's motion and ORDERS Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by APRIL 28, 2021. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/24/21. (lcckk3) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-03-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or otherwise respond to 1 by 4/28/2021. (dot) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar