Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00545
Date Filed2021-03-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed Reporter Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning plans for implementing the Trump rally that resulted in the storming of the Capitol building. Leopold also requested expedited processing. The agency components acknowledged receipt of the request. Some components granted Leopold's request for expedited processing while others did not. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantNATIONAL PROTECTION AND PROGRAMS DIRECTORATE
DefendantOFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS
DefendantOFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES
DefendantOFFICE OF OPERATIONS COORDINATION AND PLANNING
DefendantFEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
DefendantTRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. SECRET SERVICE
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-021COMPLAINT against FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, NATIONAL PROTECTION AND PROGRAMS DIRECTORATE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, OFFICE OF OPERATIONS COORDINATION AND PLANNING, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8265050) filed by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8, # 2 Exhibit 9-16, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-03-022NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-03-023LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-03-02Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-03-024SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, NATIONAL PROTECTION AND PROGRAMS DIRECTORATE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, OFFICE OF OPERATIONS COORDINATION AND PLANNING, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-04-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 3/17/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES served on 3/17/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/17/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-058RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY served on 3/17/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-059RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS served on 3/17/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-0510RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF OPERATIONS COORDINATION AND PLANNING served on 3/17/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-0511RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 3/17/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-0512RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. SECRET SERVICE served on 3/17/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-0513RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/22/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-0514RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/22/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/21/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar