Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMUSGRAVE v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00554
Date Filed2021-03-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffSHAWN MUSGRAVE
Case DescriptionShawn Musgrave, a freelance journalist, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning @ DevinCow Twitter account, an anonymous Twitter account parodying Rep. Devin Nunes, who sued to try to have the site shut down. The FBI and the Office of Information Policy acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Musgrave filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-031COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8268158) filed by SHAWN MUSGRAVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-03Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-223RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/18/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/17/2021. (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar