Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00558
Date Filed2021-03-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed Reporter Jason Leopold submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning planning for the Trump Rally that ended with the attendees storming the U.S. Capitol. Leopold also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-031COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8270268) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8, # 2 Exhibit 9-16, # 3 Exhibit 17-23, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-032NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-033LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-03Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-034SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-04-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/22/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 3/22/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/22/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-058RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/22/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/21/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar