Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleIMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT et al v. US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Maine
CityPortland
Case Number2:2021cv00066
Date Filed2021-03-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR
PlaintiffIMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT
PlaintiffUNIVERSITY OF MAINE SCHOOL OF LAW REFUGEE AND HUMAN RIGHTS CLINIC
TERMINATED: 03/04/2021
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Immigrant Legal Advocacy Project, the University of Maine School of Law Refugee and Human Rights Clinic, and the ACLU of Maine submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning ICE detention policies in Maine, particularly as they related to the pandemic. The requesters also asked for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Immigrant Legal Advocacy Project and the other requesters filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-031COMPLAINT against US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SCHOOL OF LAW REFUGEE AND HUMAN RIGHTS CLINIC, IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION. (Service of Process Deadline 6/1/2021) Fee due by 3/5/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 1/15/21 ICE FOIA, # 2 Exhibit B - 2/12/21 FOIA request, # 3 Exhibit C - ICE Webpage, # 4 Exhibit D - 2/22/21 email)(bfa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-032CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-03Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2456578.), filed by UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SCHOOL OF LAW REFUGEE AND HUMAN RIGHTS CLINIC, IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION.(BOND, EMMA) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-033Summons Issued as to US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-044AMENDED COMPLAINT against US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, filed by IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION. (Service of Process Deadline 6/2/2021) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - Jan. 15, 2021 Email, # 3 Exhibit C - ICE Webpage, # 4 Exhibit D - Feb. 21, 2021 Email)(BOND, EMMA) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-045Summons Issued as to US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (tcs) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-156AFFIDAVIT of Service by IMMIGRANT LEGAL ADVOCACY PROJECT, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION. US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 3/8/2021. (BOND, EMMA) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-15Set Answer Deadline for US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT: Answer due by 5/7/2021. (tcs) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-15Set Deadlines: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney PHILIP MANTIS must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 3/22/2021. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (tcs) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-167NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY E. EILER on behalf of US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (EILER, ASHLEY) (Entered: 03/16/2021)
2021-04-078ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, by US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(EILER, ASHLEY) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
2021-04-089NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 4/16/2021 at 11:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. The parties have been provided with the Court's call-in information. (MFS) (Entered: 04/08/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar