Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00572
Date Filed2021-03-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of Defense, and the Department of the Interior for records concerning securing the U.S. Capitol Building during the January 6 congressional session to count the electoral votes. CREW also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Most agencies granted CREW's requests for expedited processing and a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-041COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8274721) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons US Attorney, # 4 Summons DOJ, # 5 Summons DHS, # 6 Summons DOD, # 7 Summons Army, # 8 Summons Interior)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-04Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-043SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/15/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/14/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/15/2021; DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/16/2021; DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/15/2021; DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY served on 3/15/2021; DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 3/15/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/15/21. (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-04-145NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Thomas Craigmyle on behalf of All Defendants (Craigmyle, Bradley) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/15/2021) (ztth). (Entered: 04/14/2021)
2021-04-146ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Craigmyle, Bradley) (Entered: 04/14/2021)
2021-04-147NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate Cases by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion to Consolidate Cases filed in Leopold v. DOJ, No. 1:21-cv-558 (APM) (D.D.C.))(Craigmyle, Bradley) (Entered: 04/14/2021)
2021-04-14MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before April 28, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/14/2014. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/14/2021)
2021-04-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/28/2021. (tj) (Entered: 04/15/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar