Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00577
Date Filed2021-03-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed Reporter Jason Leopold submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense, the National Guard Bureau, and the Department of the Army for records concerning the Jan. 6 attack on the U.S. Capitol and the government's response. Leopold also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further any of the agencies, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantNATIONAL GUARD BUREAU
DefendantU.S. ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-041COMPLAINT against NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8277002) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-042NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-043LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-04Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-044SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-04-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ARMY served on 3/25/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/25/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU served on 3/22/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-058RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/26/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-059RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar