Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00578
Date Filed2021-03-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffLINDA YOO LEE
Case DescriptionLinda Yoo Lee, an attorney, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the entries of her client Sabino Flores-Gonzalez into the United States. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Lee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-041COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8277395) filed by LINDA YOO LEE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Summons DHS, # 4 Summons US ATTORNEY FOR DC, # 5 Summons US ATTORNEY GENERAL, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Piston, Michael) Modified on 3/4/2021 to correct docket entry text (zsb). (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-04Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-042SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-313NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-04-124Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar