Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00581
Date Filed2021-03-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed Reporter Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Aviation Administration for records concerning the Trump rally that resulted in storming the U.S. Capitol. He also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied Leopold's request for expedited processing and a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DefendantFEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-041COMPLAINT against FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8278986) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-042NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-043LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-05Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-03-054SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-04-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION served on 3/25/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/26/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar