Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00593
Date Filed2021-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning a January 8 telephone call between General Mark Milley and House Speaker Nancy Pelosi. The agency acknowledged of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8281479) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Defense)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-03-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-03-05Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-03-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-03-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 03/26/2021)
2021-03-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/16/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 03/26/2021)
2021-03-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/22/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 03/26/2021)
2021-04-027NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar