Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCarpezzi v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityFt. Myers
Case Number2:2021cv00180
Date Filed2021-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John L. Badalamenti
PlaintiffRobert Christopher Carpezzi
Case DescriptionRobert Carpezzi submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning a 2016 FBI investigation into the hacking of Carpezzi's AOL email account. The agency acknowledged receipt request but denied it entirely under Exemption 6 (invasion or privacy), Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records), and Exemption7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). Carpezzi then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-051COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice with Jury Demand Filing fee $402, receipt number FtM015155 filed by Robert Christopher Carpezzi. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-082NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMT) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-083CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/8/2021. (RMT) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-084SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Department of Justice. (MLS) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-04-075PROOF of proper service by Robert Christopher Carpezzi (RMT) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar