Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00610
Date Filed2021-03-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted FOIA requests to The Department of Transportation, the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Transportation, and the Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration for records concerning favoritism shown to the State of Kentucky. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DefendantINSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DefendantPIPELINE AND HAZARDOUS MATERIALS SAFETY ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-081COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8285441) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOT OIG, # 3 Summons USAO, # 4 Summons AG, # 5 Summons DOT, # 6 Summons PHMSA)(Beckerman, Laura) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/8/2021) (adh, ). (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-08Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-082SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, PIPELINE AND HAZARDOUS MATERIALS SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-093LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Beckerman, Laura) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/9/2021) (zjf). (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-104GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/10/2021. (jag) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-04-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/15/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/14/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 3/12/2021; PIPELINE AND HAZARDOUS MATERIALS SAFETY ADMINISTRATION served on 3/12/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/15/21. (Beckerman, Laura) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar