Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEL CID v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00611
Date Filed2021-03-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffBRAYAN ERNESTO DEL CID
Case DescriptionBrayan Ernesto Del Cid submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for Immigration Review for records concerning his immigration proceedings. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Del Cid filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-081COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8285563), REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by BRAYAN ERNESTO DEL CID. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Summons EOIR, # 5 Summons Acting US Attorney DC, # 6 Summons Acting AG)(Pak Yi, Diana) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-08NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to pakd@jezicfirm.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-082ERRATA by BRAYAN ERNESTO DEL CID re 1 Complaint,, Request for Summons to Issue, filed by BRAYAN ERNESTO DEL CID. (Pak Yi, Diana) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-09Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-093GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/9/2021. (jag) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-104SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW served on 3/15/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Pak Yi, Diana) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-236ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 3/18/2021. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 4/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Pak Yi, Diana) Modified on 3/24/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-237RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/18/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Pak Yi, Diana) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-24NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 6 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the event "Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney" (zjf) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-03-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/18/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/17/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Pak Yi, Diana) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-04-069NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Duffey on behalf of EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-0610NOTICE NOTICE OF CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar