Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAPM REPORTS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00619
Date Filed2021-03-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffAPM REPORTS
Case DescriptionAPM Reports submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense, U.S. Central Command, the Department of the Navy, and the Marine Corps for records concerning the investigation of killing in Haditha, Iraq. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, APM Reports filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. CENTRAL COMMAND
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
DefendantU.S. MARINE CORPS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-081COMPLAINT against U.S. CENTRAL COMMAND, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. MARINE CORPS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8287615) filed by APM REPORTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8, # 2 Exhibit 9-15, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-082NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of APM REPORTS (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-09Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-103SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CENTRAL COMMAND, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. MARINE CORPS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-04-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CENTRAL COMMAND served on 3/22/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/25/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY served on 3/25/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. MARINE CORPS served on 3/25/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-068RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/26/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-069RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar