Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCONNELL v. UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00627
Date Filed2021-03-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJAMES G. CONNELL, III
Case DescriptionJames Connell, an attorney for a Guantanamo Bay detainee, submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning the operational control exercised by the agency over detainees. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency invoked a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records. Connell filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Connell filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY filed by JAMES G. CONNELL, III. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-08SUMMONS Not Issued as to JAMES G. CONNELL, III, U.S. Attorney and Attorney General (ztd) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-10Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number: 4616105214. (ztd) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-29SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar