Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSmith v. Department of Defense
DistrictDistrict of Kansas
CityTopeka
Case Number5:2021cv03070
Date Filed2021-03-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Sam A. Crow
PlaintiffGary L. Smith
Case DescriptionGary Smith submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Defense concerning the prosecution of four military members. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Smith filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDepartment of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-081VERIFIED CIVIL COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (smnd) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-082MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Gary L. Smith. (smnd) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-083AFFIDAVIT in Support of 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary L. Smith. (smnd) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-094ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 2 ) is granted. The Clerk is directed to serve summons on the Department of Defense. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/09/21. Mailed to pro se party Gary L. Smith by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-09SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Defense, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service). (smnd) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-195Summons Returned Executed -- served by Personal Service on 3/17/2021. Department of Defense served on 3/17/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Summons served on United States Attorney. (smnd) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-04-056Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 3/29/2021. Summons served on United States Attorney General. (smnd) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-057Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 3/29/2021. Summons served on United States Department of Defense. (smnd) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-068CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until April 30, 2021 for Defendant Department of Defense to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 04/06/21. Mailed to pro se party Gary L. Smith by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar