Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00625
Date Filed2021-03-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Disease Control for records concerning communications with social media companies concerning COVID-related content. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-091COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8289556) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-092LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-09Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
2021-03-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/16/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
2021-03-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/22/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar