Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAQUALLIANCE v. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF RECLAMATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00632
Date Filed2021-03-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffAQUALLIANCE a Not-for-Profit Corporation
Case DescriptionAquAlliance submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Reclamation for records concerning a summary of water transfers taking place in 2020 under the Bureau and SLDMWA's Long-Term Water Transfer program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told AquAlliance that it found no records. AquAlliance filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AquAlliance filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF RECLAMATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-091COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES BUREAU OF RECLAMATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8291591) filed by AQUALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Summons to Defendant, # 4 Summons to Attorney General)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-092LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AQUALLIANCE (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-093ERRATA Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by AQUALLIANCE. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-10Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-104SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/15/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/14/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/17/2021) (ztth). (Entered: 03/16/2021)
2021-03-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF RECLAMATION served on 3/15/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/17/2021) (ztth). (Entered: 03/16/2021)
2021-03-167RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/15/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/17/2021) (ztth). (Entered: 03/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar