Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00638
Date Filed2021-03-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense, the U.S. National Guard Bureau, the Department of the Army, and the Department of Justice for records concerning call logs for anyone communicating on their behalf of Jan 6, 2021. American Oversight also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantNATIONAL GUARD BUREAU
DefendantU.S. ARMY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-101COMPLAINT against NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8293981) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons USAO, # 7 Summons AG, # 8 Summons Army, # 9 Summons DOD, # 10 Summons DOJ, # 11 Summons NGB)(Lewis, Emma) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Lewis, Emma) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-10Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-103SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-04-094NOTICE of Appearance by Kuntal Virendra Cholera on behalf of All Defendants (Cholera, Kuntal) (Entered: 04/09/2021)
2021-04-095ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. ARMY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Cholera, Kuntal) (Entered: 04/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar