Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR MEDICAL PROGRESS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00641
Date Filed2021-03-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffCENTER FOR MEDICAL PROGRESS
Case DescriptionThe Center for Medical Progress submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute of Health for records concerning two grant applications on brain and tissue repository. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and disclosed 214 pages. CMP inquired whether more information could be disclosed and the agency indicated that was its final response. CMP then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8294278) filed by CENTER FOR MEDICAL PROGRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-102ENTERED IN ERROR.....LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR MEDICAL PROGRESS (Di Liberto, Meredith) Modified on 3/15/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-11NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to mdiliberto@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-11NOTICE OF ERROR re 2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests; emailed to mdiliberto@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing 26.1 Disclosure(s). Please submit using the event LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure-Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-123ERRATA (Corrected Civil Cover Sheet and Corrected Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1) by CENTER FOR MEDICAL PROGRESS re 1 Complaint, filed by CENTER FOR MEDICAL PROGRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-12Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-124SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-04-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/02/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-027RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 4/1/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar