Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePETTI v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00644
Date Filed2021-03-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffMATTHEW PETTI
Case DescriptionMatthew Petti, a researcher, submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Defense for records concerning contracts for work or services in Syria. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and put both requests in the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, Petti filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8294459) filed by MATTHEW PETTI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-102NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of MATTHEW PETTI (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-103NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of MATTHEW PETTI (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-11Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-114SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-04-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/25/2021 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/26/2021. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2021. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar