Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00646
Date Filed2021-03-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Personnel Management for records concerning conference of seminars sponsored by the Federal Executive Institute in China from September 2009 to September 2012. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-101COMPLAINT against U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8294705) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-102ENTERED IN ERROR.....LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) Modified on 3/15/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-11NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to elee@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-11NOTICE OF ERROR re 2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests; emailed to elee@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing 26.1 Disclosure(s). Please submit using the event LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure-Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-123ERRATA (corrected civil cover sheet and corrected Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. re 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-12Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-124SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-04-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/02/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-027RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT served on 4/1/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar