Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOCEANA, INC. v. RAIMONDO et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00651
Date Filed2021-03-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffOCEANA, INC.
Case DescriptionOceana, Inc submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Commerce and OMB for records concerning OMB's review of final rule RIN 0648-BG45. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the request. Commerce provided 1,400 responsive records in interim responses. OMB located 10,000 responsive pages, which Oceana narrowed to 2,000. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Oceana filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantGINA RAIMONDO in her official capacity as Secretary of Commerce
DefendantROB FAIRWEATHER in his official capacity as Acting Director of the Office of Management and Budget
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-111COMPLAINT against OCEANA, INC. Raimondo et al. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8296266) filed by OCEANA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons 1, # 3 Summons 2, # 4 Summons 3, # 5 Summons 4, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit 11, # 17 Exhibit 12, # 18 Exhibit 13, # 19 Exhibit 14, # 20 Exhibit 15, # 21 Exhibit 16, # 22 Exhibit 17, # 23 Exhibit 18, # 24 Exhibit 19, # 25 Exhibit 20, # 26 Exhibit 21)(Werner, Paul) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by OCEANA, INC. (Werner, Paul) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-11Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-113SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ROB FAIRWEATHER, GINA RAIMONDO, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-114STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 03/11/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-185MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amanda Witt, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8313886. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OCEANA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Paul) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion to admit Amanda Witt pro hac vice, Dkt. 5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. Ms. Witt has submitted that she engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia, but she is not admitted to the Bar of this Court. Pursuant to LCvR 83.2(c), "[a]n attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar and the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court." Therefore, the Court DENIES Ms. Witt leave to file papers pro hac vice in this case, unless and until she gains admission to this Court's Bar. As to Ms. Witt's appearing before the Court, LCvR 83.2(d) gives the Court discretion to grant such motions. Upon consideration of Ms. Witt's declaration in accordance with LCvR 83.2(d), the Court GRANTS Ms. Witt permission to appear in court in this case. Subject to these limitations, Amanda Witt is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to to LCvR 83.6(a)/LCrR 44.5(a). Click for Instructions . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 03/18/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-246NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-04-017RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/18/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/17/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Werner, Paul) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
2021-04-018RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/18/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Werner, Paul) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
2021-04-019RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GINA RAIMONDO served on 3/17/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Werner, Paul) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
2021-04-0110RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROB FAIRWEATHER served on 3/23/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Werner, Paul) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar