Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWITTES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00652
Date Filed2021-03-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffBENJAMIN WITTES
Case DescriptionBenjamin Wittes, editor-in-chief of Lawfare, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning open-source reporting files collected by the agency on Wittes or any other journalist. Wittes also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Wittes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-111COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8296529) filed by BENJAMIN WITTES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Attorney General of the United States, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Homeland Security, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, District of Columbia)(Bracey, Kali) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-112MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Susan Kohlmann, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8296770. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BENJAMIN WITTES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Kohlmann in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bracey, Kali) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-113MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jacob Tracer, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8296842. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BENJAMIN WITTES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jake Tracer in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bracey, Kali) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-114MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kara Brandeisky, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8296990. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BENJAMIN WITTES. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kara Brandeisky in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bracey, Kali) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-11Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-115SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-236NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/15/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/14/2021. (Bracey, Kali) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-03-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/17/2021 (Bracey, Kali) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-03-249RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/19/2021. (Bracey, Kali) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-04-0610STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/06/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. 2 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Susan J. Kohlmann is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to to LCvR 83.6(a)/LCrR 44.5(a). Click for Instructions . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/06/2 021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. 3 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Jacob L. Tracer is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to to LCvR 83.6(a)/LCrR 44.5(a). Click for Instructions . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/06/202 1. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. 4 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Kara V. Brandeisky is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to to LCvR 83.6(a)/LCrR 44.5(a). Click for Instructions . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/06/ 2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-1211NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Tracer on behalf of BENJAMIN WITTES (Tracer, Jacob) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
2021-04-1212NOTICE of Appearance by Kara V. Brandeisky on behalf of BENJAMIN WITTES (Brandeisky, Kara) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
2021-04-1213NOTICE of Appearance by Susan J. Kohlmann on behalf of BENJAMIN WITTES (Kohlmann, Susan) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar