Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00659
Date Filed2021-03-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffPROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC.
PlaintiffDEMAND PROGRESS EDUCATION FUND, A PROJECT OF NEW VENTURE FUND
Case DescriptionThe Project for Privacy and Surveillance Accountability and the Demand Progress Education Fund submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning surveillance policies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPSA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-111COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8298113) filed by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC., Demand Progress Education Fund, a Project of New Venture Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 7 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 8 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-12Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-04-073LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMAND PROGRESS EDUCATION FUND, A PROJECT OF NEW VENTURE FUND, PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC. (Schaerr, Gene) Modified docket event/text on 4/8/2021 (eg). (Entered: 04/07/2021)
2021-04-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/9/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/9/2021. (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
2021-04-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/9/2021. (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
2021-04-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/9/2021 (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar