Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSimatic v. Commissioner of Social Security
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CityTacoma
Case Number3:2021cv05180
Date Filed2021-03-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge J Richard Creatura
PlaintiffJennifer R Simatic
Case DescriptionJennifer Simatic submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for records concerning her supplemental security income claim. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Simatic filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantCommissioner of Social Security
DefendantSocial Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-121MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jennifer R Simatic. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(SP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2021: # 6 Transmittal Email) (SP). (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-152DISREGARD filed in error CONSENT filed by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KAM) Modified on 4/1/2021 - document filed prematurely; no appearance by defendant. (KAM). (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-153ORDER NOT TO PROVIDE COURTESY COPIES OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD: The Administration should not file a paper or CD courtesy copy of the Administrative Record for chambers in this matter. This does not modify the procedure for any other chambers. Signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-184ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff; Copy of Order, Complaint and Summons mailed certified USPS to Defendants listed in Order.) (DK) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-185COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Jennifer R Simatic.(DK) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-246RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon the Commissioner of Social Security. (KMC - cc: Plaintiff) (Entered: 03/25/2021)
2021-03-247RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon the United States Attorney. (KMC - cc: Plaintiff) (Entered: 03/25/2021)
2021-03-298NOTICE: Plaintiff Jennifer R Simatic has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
2021-03-299RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Office of the Attorney General. (SP) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
2021-04-01NOTICE of Docket Modification re 2 Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge: Event STRICKEN as it was entered prematurely. Consent Form to be posted once the defendant has made a formal appearance. (KAM) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
2021-04-0610AMENDED COMPLAINT JENNIFER R SIMATIC against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jennifer R Simatic. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Form SSA-3288 August 27, 2020, # 2 Exhibit Letter to District Manager September 21, 2020, # 3 Exhibit Memorandum to Office Noveber 3, 2020, # 4 Exhibit Appointment Confirmation Notice for November 10, 2020, # 5 Exhibit On line SSA record)(Simatic, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar