Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00696
Date Filed2021-03-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases at the National Institute of Health for records concerning communications between the agency and Wuhan Institute of Virology pertaining to a $3.7 million contract awarded to the Wuhan Institute of Virology. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Judicial Watch to clarify that it was interested in a grant entitled Understanding the Risk of Bat Coronavirus Emergence. Judicial Watch indicated that was the document it was seeking. The agency then denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal of the decision. The agency informed Judicial Watch that the 7(A) claim was being withdrawn and that a new determination would be issued. After hearing nothing further, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8306793) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/16/2021)
2021-03-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/16/2021)
2021-03-17Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-184STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 18, 2021. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-04-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/02/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-027RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 4/1/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar