Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCADDELL CONSTRUCTION CO. (DE), LLC v. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00697
Date Filed2021-03-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCADDELL CONSTRUCTION CO. (DE), LLC
Case DescriptionCaddell Construction Co. submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Navy for records concerning contracting officer's final decision pertaining to a contract dispute between Caddell and the Navy related to construction of the nuclear power training facility at Charleston, SC. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Caddell Construction filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-161COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8306902) filed by CADDELL CONSTRUCTION CO. (DE), LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(Carpenter, Sarah) (Entered: 03/16/2021)
2021-03-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CADDELL CONSTRUCTION CO. (DE), LLC (Carpenter, Sarah) (Entered: 03/16/2021)
2021-03-17NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to skcarpenter@smithcurrie.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-173CIVIL COVER SHEET by CADDELL CONSTRUCTION CO. (DE), LLC re 1 Complaint, filed by CADDELL CONSTRUCTION CO. (DE), LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by CADDELL CONSTRUCTION CO. (DE), LLC.(Carpenter, Sarah) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-18Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-184SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-315NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-04-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY served on 3/30/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt)(Carpenter, Sarah) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar