Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00708
Date Filed2021-03-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning an investigation of allegations that immigrants were being coerced into signing deportation documents at the Adams County Correctional Center in Mississippi. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-171COMPLAINT against U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8310002) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons ICE, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-17Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-264STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/26/21. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 03/26/2021)
2021-03-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/26/21., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 3/25/2021 (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 03/26/2021)
2021-04-026NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Brudy-Everett on behalf of U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-057NOTICE of Consent to Assignment to Magistrate Judge by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-06MINUTE ORDER. In view of 7 Notice of Consent to Assignment to Magistrate Judge, Plaintiff shall file a status report by no later than April 13, 2021 indicating whether it consents to assignment to a magistrate judge for all purposes. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/6/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Status Report due by 4/13/2021. (mac) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
2021-04-078STATUS REPORT in response to April 6, 2021 Minute Order by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar