Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00733
Date Filed2021-03-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.
Case DescriptionCable News Network submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning soul singer James Brown. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing from the agency, CNN filed an administrative appeal. The agency told CNN that it would not accept an appeal until a determination had been made. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CNN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-191COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8316551) filed by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons to CIA, # 7 Summons to Attorney General, # 8 Summons to US Attorney)(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-22Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 3/23/2021 (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2021)
2021-03-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/23/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/22/2021. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2021)
2021-04-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General March 29, 2021. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-057NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
2021-04-058NOTICE OF CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar