Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBrennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv02443
Date Filed2021-03-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jed S. Rakoff
PlaintiffBrennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law
Case DescriptionThe Brennan Center for Justice submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning Homeland Security Investigations Handbooks. The Brennan Center also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Brennan Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-191COMPLAINT against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24280827)Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B).(Azmi, Nimra) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-192CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Azmi, Nimra) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-193RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law..(Azmi, Nimra) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-194FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law..(Azmi, Nimra) Modified on 3/22/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-22CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-22Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-22Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-22***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nimra H. Azmi to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Court name is not on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-225REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law..(Azmi, Nimra) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-236ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(dnh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-307MOTION for Thomas R. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24326553. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO PHV application, # 2 Text of Proposed Order).(Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 03/30/2021)
2021-03-30>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 7 MOTION for Thomas R. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24326553. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 03/30/2021)
2021-04-018ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 7 Motion for Thomas R. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/1/2021) (va) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
2021-04-019NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 4-12-2021, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:15 am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/1/2021) (va) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
2021-04-0110AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service, # 2 Affidavit of Service).(Azmi, Nimra) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
2021-04-05Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/5/2021. Courts decision: the parties need not submit a proposed Case Management Plan, but the telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference will proceed as scheduled on April 12, 2021 at 11:15 am using the dial-in information previously posted. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-0611NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Ruth Friedman on behalf of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar