Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleYOUNG v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00739
Date Filed2021-03-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffNICHOLAS E. YOUNG
Case DescriptionNicholas Young submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning surveillance of him. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency involved a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records. Young filed an administrative appeal. The Office of Information Policy upheld the denial. Young then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-201COMPLAINT against NICHOLAS YOUNG ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8317477) filed by NICHOLAS YOUNG. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Defendant Summons, # 3 Summons AG Summons, # 4 Summons US Attny Summons)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2021)
2021-03-22Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-222SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-223NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Prescott Moss on behalf of NICHOLAS E. YOUNG (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-234STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 23, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-04-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/31/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/30/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Proof of Service)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 04/08/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar