Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAMPO et al v. UNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00871
Date Filed2021-03-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffMARY ANNE CAMPO
PlaintiffJOHN CAMPO
Case DescriptionMary Anne and John Campo submitted three FOIA requests to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning Andrew Campo's work in support of BP Deep Water Horizon oil spill clean-up. The agency acknowledged receipt of two requests and told the Campos that U.S. Coast Guard records were still in the custody of that agency. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Campos filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [9]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-311COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8341274) filed by MARY ANNE CAMPO, JOHN CAMPO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplement Related Case Form, # 3 Summons NARA, # 4 Summons USAG, # 5 Summons USAO)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-03-312NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JOHN CAMPO, MARY ANNE CAMPO. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-03-31Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-03-313SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-05-044NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 05/04/2021)
2021-05-045MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 05/04/2021)
2021-05-146RESPONSE re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOHN CAMPO, MARY ANNE CAMPO. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/14/2021)
2021-05-207REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 05/20/2021)
2021-06-228RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/4/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/3/2021. (Sorenson, C.) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/22/2021) (zeg). (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-06-22NOTICE OF ERROR re 8 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to petesorenson@gmail.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Document incomplete/illegible, 2. Please refile document, 3. FYI: All Documents must be in Non-Fillable PDF format. 3. Please refile naming other defendants served. (zeg, ) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-09-249ORDER denying 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/24/2021. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
2021-09-2910Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by UNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-09-30MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion to Continue status conference. A remote status conference is now set for October 13, 2021 at 12:45 PM. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/30/2021. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
2021-10-0811ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION.(Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 10/08/2021)
2021-10-13Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 10/13/2021. Oral Order of the Court staying this matter until 11/4/2021. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar