Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKeefe v. Federal Bureau Of Investigation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv05450
Date Filed2021-06-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John G. Koeltl
PlaintiffPatrick Radden Keefe
Case DescriptionPatrick Keefe submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning Edwin Wilson, a former CIA officer who was convicted in 1983 of illegally selling weapons to Libya. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Keefe filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau Of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [9]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-06-211COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24699592)Document filed by Patrick Radden Keefe..(Novack, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2021)
2021-06-212CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Novack, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2021)
2021-06-213FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Patrick Radden Keefe..(Novack, Daniel) Modified on 6/22/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 06/21/2021)
2021-06-22CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-06-22Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-06-22Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-06-22***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel Richard Novack to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the form used for the summons is not the official FOIA A.O. Summons form; party name on the PDF 'To' section must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-06-224REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Patrick Radden Keefe..(Novack, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-06-235ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (sj) (Entered: 06/23/2021)
2021-07-016AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. Federal Bureau Of Investigation served on 7/1/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Patrick Radden Keefe..(Novack, Daniel) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-07-12Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 12:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 07/12/2021)
2021-07-167NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica F. Rosenbaum on behalf of Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-08-068ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-099ORDER: The parties are directed to submit a Rule 26(f) report byAugust 20, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/09/2021) (ama) (Entered: 08/09/2021)
2021-08-1710LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Jessica F. Rosenbaum dated August 17, 2021 re: Status Report. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Rosenbaum, Jessica) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-08-1811MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 10 Letter filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. No Rule 26(f) report required. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/18/2021) (tg) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar