Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWyoSayNo et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv05663
Date Filed2021-06-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ronnie Abrams
PlaintiffWyoSayNo
PlaintiffSierra Club
PlaintiffNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc.,
Case DescriptionWyoSayNo, the Sierra Club, and the Natural Resources Defense Council submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the proposed building of a detention center in Evanston, Wyoming. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency indicated that there were responsive records but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WyoSayNo filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [22]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-06-301COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24738457)Document filed by WyoSayNo, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.,, Sierra Club..(Tallman, Sarah) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-06-302CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tallman, Sarah) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-06-303FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.,, Sierra Club, WyoSayNo..(Tallman, Sarah) Modified on 7/1/2021 (vf). (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-06-304FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.,, Sierra Club, WyoSayNo..(Tallman, Sarah) Modified on 7/1/2021 (vf). (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-06-305MOTION for Sarah C. Tallman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24739271. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.,, Sierra Club, WyoSayNo. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Affidavit of Sarah C. Tallman, # 3 Proposed Order).(Tallman, Sarah) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-06-306RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.,..(Tallman, Sarah) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-06-307RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sierra Club..(Tallman, Sarah) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-06-308RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by WyoSayNo..(Tallman, Sarah) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-07-01>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 5 MOTION for Sarah C. Tallman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24739271. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-07-01CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(vf) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-07-01Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vf) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-07-01Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-07-01***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Sarah Chaya Tallman to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the official FOIA Summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-07-019REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.,, Sierra Club, WyoSayNo..(Tallman, Sarah) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-07-0110REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.,, Sierra Club, WyoSayNo..(Tallman, Sarah) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-07-0211ORDER granting 5 Motion for Sarah C. Tallman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc) (Entered: 07/02/2021)
2021-07-0212ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (sj) (Entered: 07/02/2021)
2021-07-0213ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (sj) (Entered: 07/02/2021)
2021-07-0214ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference August 20, 2021. The Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/2/2021) (cf) (Entered: 07/02/2021)
2021-07-0615ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference August 20, 2021. The Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. The initial pre-trial conference in this case will begin a 1:30 pm on August 20. If either party is unable to attend the conference at that time, the parties shall submit a joint letter to the Court no later than August 12 proposing alternative dates and times. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/6/2021) (rro) (Entered: 07/08/2021)
2021-07-1216AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Service was made by Mail. Document filed by WyoSayNo, Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.,, Sierra Club..(Tallman, Sarah) (Entered: 07/12/2021)
2021-08-0317CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Rebecca R. Friedman dated August 3, 2021. Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/03/2021)
2021-08-0418FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Natalia Ospina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24888018. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.,, Sierra Club, WyoSayNo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing, # 2 Exhibit Ospina Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Ospina, Natalia) Modified on 8/4/2021 (wb). (Entered: 08/04/2021)
2021-08-04>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 18 MOTION for Natalia Ospina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24888018. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. .. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) (Entered: 08/04/2021)
2021-08-0419ORDER granting 17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Rebecca R. Friedman dated August 3, 2021. Application granted. The initial conference in this action is accordingly adjourned until August 27, 2021 at 9:00 am. The parties shall submit a joint letter in advance of this conference no later than August 20, 2021. SO ORDERED. U.S. Department of Homeland Security answer due 8/19/2021; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer due 8/19/2021. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/4/2021) (va) (Entered: 08/04/2021)
2021-08-04Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (va) (Entered: 08/04/2021)
2021-08-1720JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference set for August 27, 2021 addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Sarah Tallman dated 8/17/2021., JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Letter addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Sarah Tallman dated 8/17/2021. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.,, Sierra Club, WyoSayNo..(Tallman, Sarah) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-08-1821AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 7/9/2021, answer due 8/19/2021; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 7/9/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by WyoSayNo; Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.,; Sierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D).(Tallman, Sarah) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-1822ORDER granting 20 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting 20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. The status conference is accordingly adjourned until October 8, 2021 at 2:00 pm. The parties shall submit a joint letter in advance of this conference no later than October 1, 2021. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 10/8/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/18/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-1923ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Friedman, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-2724SECOND MOTION for Natalia Ospina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24990667. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.,, Sierra Club, WyoSayNo. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Ospina Affidavit, # 3 Proposed Order).(Ospina, Natalia) (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-08-30>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 24 SECOND MOTION for Natalia Ospina to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24990667. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-3125ORDER granting 24 Motion for Natalia Ospina to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar