Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company v. U.S. Department Of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv06073
Date Filed2021-07-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Katherine Polk Failla
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
Case DescriptionThe New York Times submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning a report by former assistant special counsel Andrew Weissman concerning the Mueller investigation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. Department Of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [10]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-07-151COMPLAINT against U.S. Department Of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24797886)Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 07/15/2021)
2021-07-152CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 07/15/2021)
2021-07-153RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 07/15/2021)
2021-07-154REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 07/15/2021)
2021-07-155NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra Settelmayer on behalf of The New York Times Company..(Settelmayer, Alexandra) (Entered: 07/15/2021)
2021-07-16CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-07-16Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-07-16Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-07-166ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department Of Justice..(jgo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-07-19NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Ronnie Abrams is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 07/19/2021)
2021-08-177NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference by telephone set for 12/10/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/17/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-08-238ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice..(Jude, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/23/2021)
2021-12-029JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Joint Status Letter addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jennifer Jude dated 12/2/21. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice..(Jude, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-0310ORDER: granting 9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED.The initial pretrial conference in this matter is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. Additionally, the parties are relieved of their obligation to submit a proposed case management plan in this case. The parties shall submit a further status update on or before February 14, 2022. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 9. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/03/2021) (ama) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
2021-12-0611MOTION for Alexandra Settelmayer to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The New York Times Company..(Settelmayer, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
2021-12-0712MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Alexandra Settelmayer terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/7/2021) (rro) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar