Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-07-26 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24842388)Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 07/26/2021) |
2021-07-26 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 07/26/2021) |
2021-07-26 | 3 | RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 07/26/2021) |
2021-07-26 | 4 | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of State, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 07/26/2021) |
2021-07-26 | 5 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra Settelmayer on behalf of The New York Times Company..(Settelmayer, Alexandra) (Entered: 07/26/2021) |
2021-07-27 | | CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 07/27/2021) |
2021-07-27 | | Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 07/27/2021) |
2021-07-27 | | Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 07/27/2021) |
2021-07-27 | 6 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of State..(pc) (Entered: 07/27/2021) |
2021-08-17 | 7 | NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/10/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/17/2021) (jca) (Entered: 08/17/2021) |
2021-09-03 | 8 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Department of State..(Tarczynska, Dominika) (Entered: 09/03/2021) |
2021-12-02 | 9 | LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from David McCraw dated December 2, 2021. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/02/2021) |
2021-12-03 | 10 | ORDER: granting 9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The conference scheduled for December 10, 2021, is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. The parties shall instead file a joint letter regarding the status of this matter on or before December 10, 2021. Furthermore, the Court relieves the parties of their obligation at this time to file a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. The Clerk is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 9. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/03/2021) (ama) (Entered: 12/03/2021) |
2021-12-10 | 11 | LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from David McCraw dated December 10, 2021 re: Withdrawal Without Prejudice. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/10/2021) |
2021-12-10 | 12 | PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/10/2021) |
2021-12-10 | 13 | STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, by and between the parties, that this action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. SO ORDERED. U.S. Department of State terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/10/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 12/10/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |