Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCenter for Biological Diversity v. Bureau Of Land Management
DistrictDistrict of Nevada
CityReno
Case Number3:2021cv00347
Date Filed2021-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Larry R. Hicks
PlaintiffCenter for Biological Diversity
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the agency's approval of the Final Programmatic Environmental Impact Statement for Fuel Breaks in the Great Basin. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and placed it in the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Bureau of Land Management
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [9]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-091COMPLAINT against Bureau Of Land Management (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6588008) by Center for Biological Diversity. Proof of service due by 11/7/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (Lake, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/09/2021)
2021-08-09Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ) (Entered: 08/09/2021)
2021-08-102SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Bureau of Land Management. (DRM) (Entered: 08/10/2021)
2021-08-103CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Center for Biological Diversity. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lake, Scott) (Entered: 08/10/2021)
2021-08-134PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Lake, Scott) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-165SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Bureau of Land Management re ECF No. 4 Proposed summons. (DRM) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-186MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc D. Fink and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Scott Lake (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6601278) by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Lake, Scott) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-207ORDER granting ECF No. 6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Marc D. Fink, representing Center for Biological Diversity, and approving Designation of Local Counsel, Scott Lake. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/20/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC) (Entered: 08/20/2021)
2021-09-138STIPULATION and (proposed) Order to Fix Deadline to File Response by Defendant U.S. Bureau of Land Management. (Addington, Gregory) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-139ORDER granting ECF No. 8 Stipulation : The due date for the federal defendant to file its response to the complaint (ECF No. 1 ) is October 15, 2021 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-2110SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Biological Diversity. U.S. Bureau of Land Management served on 8/23/2021. (Lake, Scott) (Entered: 09/21/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar