Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02146
Date Filed2021-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning the monitoring of social media accounts of service members for extremist content or activity. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-111COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8660972) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Defense)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-11Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmg) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/12/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/11/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/17/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 8/16/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-187STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 18, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-09-138ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-14MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. According to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 6, 2021. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiff's request(s) and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiffs request(s) can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 14, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/6/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar