Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02147
Date Filed2021-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the investigation of the origins of the SARS virus or COVID-19 by the Bureau of Arms Control Verification. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-08-111COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8661014) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of State)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-11Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/11/2021)
2021-08-124STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/12/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/12/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/11/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/17/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/17/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-09-138ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Department of State's answer, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before October 15, 2021, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear telephonically for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 22, 2021, at 2:00 p.m., before Judge Randolph D. Moss. The parties can obtain a teleconference number and access code from the Deputy Clerk prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/13/2021. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar