Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCarter v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2021cv04536
Date Filed2021-08-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge LaShann DeArcy Hall
PlaintiffDarryl Carter
Case DescriptionDarryl Carter submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning tips about public corruption and other crimes. He also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing from the agency Carter filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-07-221REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)
2021-07-222COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice. Document filed by Darryl Carter..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)
2021-07-22Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)
2021-07-223PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Darryl Carter consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Darryl Carter..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)
2021-07-224DECLARATION In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for CM/ECF Case Filing. Document filed by Darryl Carter. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)
2021-07-225REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Dept. of Justice, Civil Division, re: 2 Complaint. Document filed by Darryl Carter. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/23/2021)
2021-07-226RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/23/2021)
2021-07-22MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis See Document 1 by Darryl Carter. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-07-26NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/26/2021)
2021-07-277MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, re: for Permission for Darryl Carter to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/28/2021)
2021-07-308LETTER from D. Carter, dated 7/30/21 re: "CLERK'S OFFICE MISCONDUCT" - Please note that the Clerk's Office is engaging in misconduct which interferes with the timely and orderly administration of the Court's business etc. The Clerk's Office has no authority to decide what is or is not acceptable email address to submit papers to the Court, and seeks a cover-up solution in the background via its relationship with Microsoft for emails service. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/30/2021)
2021-07-319LETTER from D. Carter, dated 7/31/21 re: "HARASSMENT FOLLOWING DOC #8, PLAINTIFF HAS NOTHING TO DO WITH MEXICO, PLEASE CONTROL YOUR JUDICIAL OFFICERS" - In short, it is the duty and obligation of this Court to control its people and operatives and the influence exerted, on such individuals in this Court via outside of this court including via the Eastern District Court in Brooklyn, New York etc. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/02/2021)
2021-08-0410TRANSFER ORDER: The Court transfers the action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to terminate all motions filed in this action. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without payment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/4/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/05/2021)
2021-08-0611LETTER from D. Carter, dated 8/6/21 re: "THE DEAD FISHERMAN & THE SENATE ARMED FORCES COMMITTEE INVESTIGATION REQUEST PER MILITARY ILLEGAL SURVEILLANCE, HARASSMENT, AND THREATS DIRECTED TOWARD PLAINTIFF"- The FOIA complaint seeks to unearth all documents, papers, etc. relating to the inquiry of a federal government deep seeded cover-up[likely felonious] activity of one or more federal officials. The conditions in which the plaintiff currently resides represent extreme and radical human rights violations all aimed at covering up and protecting the responsible federal government officials. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-0612NOTICE OF APPEAL from 10 Order. Document filed by Darryl Carter. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(nd) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/09/2021)
2021-08-09Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 12 Notice of Appeal..(nd) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/09/2021)
2021-08-09Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 12 Notice of Appeal filed by Darryl Carter were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(nd) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/09/2021)
2021-08-1213Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-06242. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-1214In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/12/2021)
2021-08-1715Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification by Darryl Carter dated 8/17/2021. (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-17Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Layne, Monique) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar